Senate | 05/09/2023 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler | ||
Senate | 04/26/2023 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison | ||
Senate | 04/21/2023 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford | ||
Senate | 03/31/2023 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 03/31/2023 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Postponed - Insurance | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Insurance | ||
Senate | 03/28/2023 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa | ||
Senate | 03/28/2023 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Insurance | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 31, 2023 | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Fine | ||
Senate | 03/10/2023 | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 24, 2023 | ||
Senate | 02/21/2023 | Assigned to Insurance | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Fine |