Senate
|
08/04/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0502
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2023
|
Effective Date August 4, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Senate Concurs
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 054-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Transportation; 011-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Transportation
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Mike Simmons
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2 - May 16, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Eva-Dina Delgado
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kam Buckner
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety; 010-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kam Buckner
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Hoan Huynh
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sally J. Turner
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Chief House Sponsor Rep. Kam Buckner
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina H. Pacione-Zayas
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 23, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Simmons
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Transportation; 015-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Transportation
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mike Simmons
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 9, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Do Pass Transportation; 015-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
Assigned to Transportation
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mike Simmons
|
|
|