Senate
|
08/04/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0503
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2023
|
Effective Date January 1, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Senate Concurs
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 056-001-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Education; 012-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 16, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 097-013-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools; 007-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Carol Ammons
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools; 007-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Chief House Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Lightford
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Recalled to Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Education; 013-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 29, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 23, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Do Pass as Amended Education; 008-004-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 24, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
Assigned to Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
|
|
|