Senate
|
06/26/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Porfirio
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Public Health
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Sally J. Turner
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Javier L. Cervantes
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Donald P. DeWitte
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael W. Halpin
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert F. Martwick
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 9, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Do Pass Public Health; 008-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Andrew S. Chesney
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Faraci
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
Assigned to Public Health
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2023
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Sally J. Turner
|
|
|