Senate | 03/10/2023 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | To Subcommittee on Liquor | ||
Senate | 02/28/2023 | Assigned to Executive | ||
Senate | 02/15/2023 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura | ||
Senate | 02/15/2023 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine | ||
Senate | 02/10/2023 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 02/10/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 02/10/2023 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam |