Senate
|
08/07/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0512
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/07/2023
|
Effective Date January 1, 2025
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/07/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Hoan Huynh
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sharon Chung
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Harry Benton
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Matt Hanson
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jenn Ladisch Douglass
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Beth Canty
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Insurance Committee; 012-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Faver Dias
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Assigned to Insurance Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Will Guzzardi
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Chief House Sponsor Rep. Laura Faver Dias
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** March 24, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 21, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 9, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Do Pass as Amended Insurance; 010-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Insurance
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Javier L. Cervantes
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Insurance
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ann Gillespie
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Insurance
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2023
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ann Gillespie
|
|
|