Senate | 09/19/2024 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler | ||
Senate | 06/12/2024 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman | ||
Senate | 05/21/2024 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz | ||
Senate | 05/21/2024 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine | ||
Senate | 05/15/2024 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Natalie Toro | ||
Senate | 04/26/2024 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Lakesia Collins | ||
Senate | 02/23/2023 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura | ||
Senate | 02/10/2023 | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Laura M. Murphy | ||
Senate | 02/10/2023 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 02/10/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 02/10/2023 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mary Edly-Allen |