Senate | 03/10/2023 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Willie Preston | ||
Senate | 02/28/2023 | Assigned to Appropriations- Education | ||
Senate | 02/10/2023 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 02/10/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 02/10/2023 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |