Senate
|
08/04/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0469
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2023
|
Effective Date January 1, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Abdelnasser Rashid
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Beth Canty
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert "Bob" Rita
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sharon Chung
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jenn Ladisch Douglass
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Higher Education Committee; 010-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Assigned to Higher Education Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Chief House Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** March 24, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 21, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 9, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Do Pass Higher Education; 010-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Higher Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2023
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Cristina Castro
|
|
|