Senate | 03/10/2023 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 03/10/2023 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina H. Pacione-Zayas | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | Postponed - Health and Human Services | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Health and Human Services | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Waive Posting Notice | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Health and Human Services | ||
Senate | 03/03/2023 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 03/03/2023 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Sara Feigenholtz | ||
Senate | 02/28/2023 | Assigned to Health and Human Services | ||
Senate | 02/10/2023 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 02/10/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 02/10/2023 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Sara Feigenholtz |