Senate | 05/03/2024 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 05/03/2024 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 04/05/2024 | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 3, 2024 | ||
Senate | 03/15/2024 | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 5, 2024 | ||
Senate | 01/10/2024 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Re-assigned to Appropriations- Education | ||
Senate | 01/10/2024 | Re-assigned to Appropriations- Education | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Appropriations- Education | ||
Senate | 03/03/2023 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 03/03/2023 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Rachel Ventura | ||
Senate | 02/28/2023 | Assigned to Appropriations- Education | ||
Senate | 02/10/2023 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 02/10/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 02/10/2023 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Rachel Ventura |