Senate
|
07/05/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/05/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0111
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2023
|
Effective Date June 29, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2023
|
Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Matt Hanson
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 19, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Travis Weaver
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth "Lisa" Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Faver Dias
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Eva-Dina Delgado
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Elik
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools; 006-002-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Chief House Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 21, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 9, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Do Pass as Amended Early Childhood Education; 009-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Early Childhood Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Early Childhood Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8 (b-1), the following amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Cristina H. Pacione-Zayas
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Cristina H. Pacione-Zayas
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Early Childhood Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2023
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Cristina H. Pacione-Zayas
|
|
|