Senate | 02/08/2024 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sally J. Turner | ||
Senate | 03/10/2023 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 03/10/2023 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Appropriations - Health and Human Services | ||
Senate | 03/03/2023 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 03/03/2023 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam | ||
Senate | 02/28/2023 | Assigned to Appropriations - Health and Human Services | ||
Senate | 02/10/2023 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 02/10/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 02/10/2023 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam |