Senate | 05/16/2023 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva | ||
Senate | 05/11/2023 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam | ||
Senate | 05/05/2023 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons | ||
Senate | 04/28/2023 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters | ||
Senate | 04/26/2023 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Javier L. Cervantes | ||
Senate | 04/25/2023 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Karina Villa |