Senate | 03/15/2024 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 03/13/2024 | Postponed - Insurance | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | Assigned to Insurance | ||
Senate | 05/02/2023 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 05/02/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 05/02/2023 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Cristina Castro |