Senate
|
06/26/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2024
|
Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 10, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 18, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As April 19, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Labor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Willie Preston
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Porfirio
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2024
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Javier L. Cervantes
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 22, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2024
|
Do Pass Labor; 012-003-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 5, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
Postponed - Labor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2024
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
Assigned to Labor
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/07/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/18/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/18/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/18/2023
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Willie Preston
|
|
|