House
|
05/03/2024
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
Assigned to Insurance Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Faraci
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Seth Lewis
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Porfirio
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
Chief House Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2024
|
Third Reading - Passed; 050-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2024
|
Recalled to Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 12, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Hastings
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Insurance; 008-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Insurance
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 9, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2024
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Tom Bennett
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Donald P. DeWitte
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael W. Halpin
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patrick J. Joyce
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Lakesia Collins
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Javier L. Cervantes
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert F. Martwick
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sally J. Turner
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 14, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
Do Pass Insurance; 008-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
Assigned to Insurance
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/07/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/07/2023
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings
|
|
|