House
|
05/31/2024
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2024
|
Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 27, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2024
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2024
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2024
|
Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Counties & Townships Committee; 006-002-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Counties & Townships Committee; by Voice Vote
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2024
|
Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed 072-040-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2024
|
Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Counties & Townships Committee; Rep. Elizabeth "Lisa" Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Counties & Townships Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Matt Hanson
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2024
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2024
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2024
|
Committee/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 24, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2024
|
Assigned to Counties & Townships Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2024
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2024
|
Chief House Sponsor Rep. Matt Hanson
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2024
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2024
|
Third Reading - Passed; 054-001-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 8, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
Do Pass as Amended Judiciary; 009-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2024
|
Waive Posting Notice
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 17, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Rachel Ventura
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2024
|
Re-assigned to Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 10, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 19, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 5, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
Assigned to Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2024
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2024
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Rachel Ventura
|
|
|