Senate
|
08/02/2024
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0757
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/02/2024
|
Effective Date August 2, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/02/2024
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2024
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Kelly
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2024
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2024
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Weber
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Paul Jacobs
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 009-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
Chief House Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2024
|
Third Reading - Passed; 058-001-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading **
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 10, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 9, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2024
|
Do Pass as Amended Licensed Activities; 009-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 5, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Javier L. Cervantes
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Assigned to Licensed Activities
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2024
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2024
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Javier L. Cervantes
|
|
|