Senate
|
07/01/2024
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0628
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2024
|
Effective Date July 1, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2024
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2024
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-001-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 009-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
Chief House Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2024
|
Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4a
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4a
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 12, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Recommend Do Adopt Licensed Activities; 005-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 12, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Do Pass as Amended Licensed Activities; 009-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Licensed Activities
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve McClure
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2024
|
Assigned to Licensed Activities
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2024
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2024
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison
|
|
|