Senate
|
07/01/2024
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0630
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2024
|
Effective Date January 1, 2025
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2024
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2024
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sharon Chung
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Beth Canty
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Abdelnasser Rashid
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 074-039-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2024
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Housing; 011-006-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
Assigned to Housing
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
Chief House Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 22, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2024
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 009-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 8, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2024
|
Do Pass Judiciary; 007-002-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2024
|
Assigned to Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2024
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2024
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy
|
|
|