Senate
|
07/01/2024
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0634
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2024
|
Effective Date January 1, 2025
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2024
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2024
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2024
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Harry Benton
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2024
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Police & Fire Committee; 013-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregg Johnson
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Swanson
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
Assigned to Police & Fire Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
Chief House Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Recalled to Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Local Government; 010-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 11, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Local Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael W. Halpin
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 20, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Do Pass Local Government; 009-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Assigned to Local Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael W. Halpin
|
|
|