Senate
|
07/01/2024
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0635
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2024
|
Effective Date January 1, 2025
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2024
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2024
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2024
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 072-039-001
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2024
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Economic Opportunity & Equity Committee; 005-002-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Nabeela Syed
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Assigned to Economic Opportunity & Equity Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kimberly Du Buclet
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
Chief House Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4a
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Third Reading - Passed; 039-019-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 20, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Faraci
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Javier L. Cervantes
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 7, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Do Pass as Amended Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Adriane Johnson
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Adriane Johnson
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Porfirio
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Postponed - Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Lakesia Collins
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Natalie Toro
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael W. Halpin
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Assigned to Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2024
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2024
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Adriane Johnson
|
|
|