Senate
|
08/09/2024
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0933
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/09/2024
|
Effective Date January 1, 2025
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/09/2024
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2024
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Javier L. Cervantes
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2024
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2024
|
Senate Concurs
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 059-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Seth Lewis
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt State Government; 008-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to State Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Tom Bennett
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 20, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2024
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted by Voice Vote
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2024
|
Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Vehicles & Safety; 011-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2024
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jason Bunting
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety; 011-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Sheehan
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dennis Tipsword, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2024
|
Chief House Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2024
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Craig Wilcox
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 20, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 14, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
Do Pass as Amended Transportation; 014-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Transportation
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Tom Bennett
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Postponed - Transportation
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Assigned to Transportation
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2024
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2024
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Tom Bennett
|
|
|