Senate
|
06/26/2024
|
Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Seth Lewis
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Natalie Toro
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Faraci
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Javier L. Cervantes
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Assigned to Appropriations - Health and Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2024
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2024
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Karina Villa
|
|
|