Senate
|
08/02/2024
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0771
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/02/2024
|
Effective Date June 1, 2025
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/02/2024
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2024
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2024
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 105-006-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2024
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin McLaughlin
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2024
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandun Schweizer
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2024
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin Schmidt
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2024
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2024
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Sanalitro
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools; 008-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
Chief House Sponsor Rep. Amy Elik
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2024
|
Third Reading - Passed; 058-001-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading **
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 20, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 7, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Do Pass as Amended Education; 011-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Postponed - Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Assigned to Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2024
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2024
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel
|
|
|