Senate
|
08/09/2024
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0949
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/09/2024
|
Effective Date January 1, 2025
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/09/2024
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2024
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Javier L. Cervantes
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregg Johnson
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Harry Benton
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2024
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Police & Fire Committee; 013-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed 071-039-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Police & Fire Committee; Rep. Kam Buckner
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2024
|
Committee/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 24, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2024
|
Assigned to Police & Fire Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2024
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2024
|
Chief House Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Kelly
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2024
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patrick J. Joyce
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2024
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2024
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Willie Preston
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2024
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Faraci
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2024
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2024
|
Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Toro
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Special Committee on Criminal Law and Public Safety; 008-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Special Committee on Criminal Law and Public Safety
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Natalie Toro
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 14, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2024
|
Do Pass Special Committee on Criminal Law and Public Safety; 010-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 17, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 3, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 19, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 5, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2024
|
Assigned to Special Committee on Criminal Law and Public Safety
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Natalie Toro
|
|
|