Senate
|
08/09/2024
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0961
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/09/2024
|
Effective Date January 1, 2025; Some Provisions
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/09/2024
|
Effective Date August 9, 2024; Some Provisions;
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/09/2024
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2024
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2024
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2024
|
Senate Concurs
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 046-011-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Executive; 012-001-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Christopher Belt
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 22, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2024
|
Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 088-022-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2024
|
Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 24, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2024
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2024
|
Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Higher Education Committee; 012-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Higher Education Committee; by Voice Vote
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2024
|
Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 10, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Higher Education Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2024
|
Re-assigned to Higher Education Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Justin Slaughter
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
Assigned to Economic Opportunity & Equity Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Chief House Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2024
|
Third Reading - Passed; 056-003-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading **
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 20, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 22, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Do Pass Executive; 012-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2024
|
Assigned to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Christopher Belt
|
|
|