Senate
|
08/30/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2024
|
Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patrick J. Joyce
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael W. Halpin
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Faraci
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Appropriations - Health and Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Porfirio
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Sponsor Removed Sen. Mike Porfirio
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Porfirio
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Assigned to Appropriations - Health and Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2024
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2024
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2024
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison
|
|
|