Senate
|
08/09/2024
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0977
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/09/2024
|
Effective Date January 1, 2025
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/09/2024
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2024
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2024
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2024
|
Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 24, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2024
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2024
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Financial Institutions and Licensing Committee; 012-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
Assigned to Financial Institutions and Licensing Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Chief House Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Recalled to Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 008-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Robert F. Martwick
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 20, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 7, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Do Pass Judiciary; 008-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Assigned to Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2024
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2024
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Robert F. Martwick
|
|
|