Senate | 05/17/2024 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva | ||
Senate | 05/03/2024 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 04/05/2024 | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 3, 2024 | ||
Senate | 03/15/2024 | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 5, 2024 | ||
Senate | 02/20/2024 | Assigned to Revenue | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |