Senate
|
11/20/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Javier L. Cervantes
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2024
|
Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 26, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 25, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 24, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 17, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 To Subcommittee on End of Life Issues
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 3, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 5, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
To Subcommittee on End of Life Issues
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Assigned to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Sen. Cristina Castro
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2024
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2024
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2024
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes
|
|
|