House
|
05/31/2024
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2024
|
Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 27, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2024
|
Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 24, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2024
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 017-008-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2024
|
Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 10, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2024
|
Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2024
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2024
|
Chief House Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Third Reading - Passed; 046-010-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 20, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 7, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Do Pass Labor; 012-003-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Assigned to Labor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2024
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2024
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam
|
|
|