Senate
|
08/09/2024
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-1027
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/09/2024
|
Effective Date August 9, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/09/2024
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2024
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2024
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2024
|
Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 24, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2024
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 018-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
Chief House Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2024
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2024
|
Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 12, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Revenue; 009-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Revenue
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Sara Feigenholtz
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 20, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Do Pass as Amended Revenue; 009-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Postponed - Revenue
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Sara Feigenholtz
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Assigned to Revenue
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2024
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2024
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Sara Feigenholtz
|
|
|