Senate | 04/09/2024 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Tom Bennett | ||
Senate | 04/08/2024 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Donald P. DeWitte | ||
Senate | 03/15/2024 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 03/06/2024 | Postponed - Labor | ||
Senate | 02/28/2024 | Assigned to Labor | ||
Senate | 02/09/2024 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 02/09/2024 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 02/09/2024 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Sally J. Turner |