Senate | 10/24/2024 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman | ||
Senate | 05/22/2024 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine | ||
Senate | 05/16/2024 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III | ||
Senate | 05/10/2024 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Porfirio | ||
Senate | 05/10/2024 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison | ||
Senate | 03/18/2024 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy | ||
Senate | 03/15/2024 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 02/20/2024 | Assigned to Energy and Public Utilities | ||
Senate | 02/09/2024 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 02/09/2024 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 02/09/2024 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham |