Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Porfirio
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Javier L. Cervantes
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 19, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2024
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mike Simmons
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 5, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Assigned to Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2024
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2024
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mike Simmons
|
|
|