Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Adopted Both Houses
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Resolution Adopted 101-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Regulations, Roads & Bridges; 010-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed 004-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Transportation: Regulations, Roads & Bridges; Rep. Barbara Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Assigned to Transportation: Regulations, Roads & Bridges
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Chief House Sponsor Rep. Paul Jacobs
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Alternate Chief Sponsor Removed Rep. Patrick Windhorst
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Chief House Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Resolution Adopted; 056-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 18, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Approved for Consideration Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Filed with Secretary
|
|
|