LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Illinois IL
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SJR0047
Action History
IL
Illinois Senate Bill SJR0047
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Illinois 2023-2024 Regular Session
Illinois Senate Bill SJR0047
Action History
Senate
06/26/2024
Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Senate
04/10/2024
Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions April 11, 2024
Senate
04/10/2024
Be Adopted Executive; 008-003-000
Senate
02/20/2024
Assigned to Executive
Senate
02/02/2024
Referred to Assignments
Senate
02/02/2024
Filed with Secretary