Senate | 05/26/2024 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter | ||
Senate | 05/26/2024 | Resolution Adopted | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions February 20, 2024 | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | Be Adopted Human Rights; 005-000-000 | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | Assigned to Human Rights | ||
Senate | 11/08/2023 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 11/08/2023 | Filed with Secretary |