1 | 1 | | SR1087LRB103 41217 ECR 74434 r SR1087 LRB103 41217 ECR 74434 r |
---|
2 | 2 | | SR1087 LRB103 41217 ECR 74434 r |
---|
3 | 3 | | 1 SENATE RESOLUTION |
---|
4 | 4 | | 2 WHEREAS, The members of the Illinois Senate are saddened |
---|
5 | 5 | | 3 to learn of the death of Ronald I. "Ron" Peterson of Andover, |
---|
6 | 6 | | 4 who passed away on June 22, 2024; and |
---|
7 | 7 | | 5 WHEREAS, Ron Peterson, the son of Florence (Johnson) and |
---|
8 | 8 | | 6 Ivan Peterson, was born in Moline on May 24, 1936; he attended |
---|
9 | 9 | | 7 Andover and Orion schools, graduating in 1953; he then |
---|
10 | 10 | | 8 graduated from the Moline Institute of Commerce in 1954; he |
---|
11 | 11 | | 9 served in the U.S. Marine Corps from 1958 until he was |
---|
12 | 12 | | 10 honorably discharged in 1964; he married Eilene Peterson at |
---|
13 | 13 | | 11 Calvary Lutheran Church in Moline on September 14, 1963; and |
---|
14 | 14 | | 12 WHEREAS, Ron Peterson worked as a controller for Thoms |
---|
15 | 15 | | 13 Proestler, Co. in Rock Island, retiring in August 2002; and |
---|
16 | 16 | | 14 WHEREAS, Ron Peterson was named the 1985 Man of the Year by |
---|
17 | 17 | | 15 the Orion Chamber of Commerce for his work on Andover's 150th |
---|
18 | 18 | | 16 celebration, and he was given a key to the Village of Andover |
---|
19 | 19 | | 17 in 2011; and |
---|
20 | 20 | | 18 WHEREAS, Ron Peterson was devoted to his faith; he was |
---|
21 | 21 | | 19 baptized at the Augustana Lutheran Church on July 5, 1936, and |
---|
22 | 22 | | 20 he was confirmed on June 5, 1949; and |
---|
23 | 23 | | |
---|
24 | 24 | | |
---|
25 | 25 | | |
---|
26 | 26 | | SR1087 LRB103 41217 ECR 74434 r |
---|
27 | 27 | | |
---|
28 | 28 | | |
---|
29 | 29 | | SR1087- 2 -LRB103 41217 ECR 74434 r SR1087 - 2 - LRB103 41217 ECR 74434 r |
---|
30 | 30 | | SR1087 - 2 - LRB103 41217 ECR 74434 r |
---|
31 | 31 | | 1 WHEREAS, Ron Peterson was dedicated to his church, his |
---|
32 | 32 | | 2 family, and his community; and |
---|
33 | 33 | | 3 WHEREAS, Ron Peterson was preceded in death by his |
---|
34 | 34 | | 4 parents; and |
---|
35 | 35 | | 5 WHEREAS, Ron Peterson is survived by his wife of 60 years, |
---|
36 | 36 | | 6 Eilene Peterson; his children, Laura (Brad) Rickey and Craig |
---|
37 | 37 | | 7 (Doris) Peterson; his grandchildren, Allison (Dalton), Karl, |
---|
38 | 38 | | 8 Ashley, and Eva; his brother, Dave (Deb) Peterson; and many |
---|
39 | 39 | | 9 nieces, nephews, cousins, grandnieces, and grandnephews; |
---|
40 | 40 | | 10 therefore, be it |
---|
41 | 41 | | 11 RESOLVED, BY THE SENATE OF THE ONE HUNDRED THIRD GENERAL |
---|
42 | 42 | | 12 ASSEMBLY OF THE STATE OF ILLINOIS, that we mourn the passing of |
---|
43 | 43 | | 13 Ronald I. "Ron" Peterson and extend our sincere condolences to |
---|
44 | 44 | | 14 his family, friends, and all who knew and loved him; and be it |
---|
45 | 45 | | 15 further |
---|
46 | 46 | | |
---|
47 | 47 | | |
---|
48 | 48 | | |
---|
49 | 49 | | |
---|
50 | 50 | | |
---|
51 | 51 | | SR1087 - 2 - LRB103 41217 ECR 74434 r |
---|