Illinois 2023-2024 Regular Session

Illinois Senate Bill SR1087 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 10/11/2024

                            SR1087LRB103 41217 ECR 74434 r   SR1087  LRB103 41217 ECR 74434 r
  SR1087  LRB103 41217 ECR 74434 r
1  SENATE RESOLUTION
2  WHEREAS, The members of the Illinois Senate are saddened
3  to learn of the death of Ronald I. "Ron" Peterson of Andover,
4  who passed away on June 22, 2024; and
5  WHEREAS, Ron Peterson, the son of Florence (Johnson) and
6  Ivan Peterson, was born in Moline on May 24, 1936; he attended
7  Andover and Orion schools, graduating in 1953; he then
8  graduated from the Moline Institute of Commerce in 1954; he
9  served in the U.S. Marine Corps from 1958 until he was
10  honorably discharged in 1964; he married Eilene Peterson at
11  Calvary Lutheran Church in Moline on September 14, 1963; and
12  WHEREAS, Ron Peterson worked as a controller for Thoms
13  Proestler, Co. in Rock Island, retiring in August 2002; and
14  WHEREAS, Ron Peterson was named the 1985 Man of the Year by
15  the Orion Chamber of Commerce for his work on Andover's 150th
16  celebration, and he was given a key to the Village of Andover
17  in 2011; and
18  WHEREAS, Ron Peterson was devoted to his faith; he was
19  baptized at the Augustana Lutheran Church on July 5, 1936, and
20  he was confirmed on June 5, 1949; and

 

  SR1087  LRB103 41217 ECR 74434 r


SR1087- 2 -LRB103 41217 ECR 74434 r   SR1087 - 2 - LRB103 41217 ECR 74434 r
  SR1087 - 2 - LRB103 41217 ECR 74434 r
1  WHEREAS, Ron Peterson was dedicated to his church, his
2  family, and his community; and
3  WHEREAS, Ron Peterson was preceded in death by his
4  parents; and
5  WHEREAS, Ron Peterson is survived by his wife of 60 years,
6  Eilene Peterson; his children, Laura (Brad) Rickey and Craig
7  (Doris) Peterson; his grandchildren, Allison (Dalton), Karl,
8  Ashley, and Eva; his brother, Dave (Deb) Peterson; and many
9  nieces, nephews, cousins, grandnieces, and grandnephews;
10  therefore, be it
11  RESOLVED, BY THE SENATE OF THE ONE HUNDRED THIRD GENERAL
12  ASSEMBLY OF THE STATE OF ILLINOIS, that we mourn the passing of
13  Ronald I. "Ron" Peterson and extend our sincere condolences to
14  his family, friends, and all who knew and loved him; and be it
15  further

 

 

  SR1087 - 2 - LRB103 41217 ECR 74434 r