Senate
|
04/29/2025
|
Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Christopher Belt
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2025
|
Assigned to Revenue
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2025
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2025
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2025
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2025
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2025
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2025
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2025
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2025
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2025
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2025
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2025
|
Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Cities & Villages Committee; 011-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2025
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Cities & Villages Committee; by Voice Vote
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2025
|
Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jay Hoffman
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2025
|
Re-assigned to Cities & Villages Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2025
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Cities & Villages Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2025
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2025
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2025
|
Assigned to Executive Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2025
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
12/17/2024
|
Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch
|
|
|