Senate | 04/30/2025 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 1, 2025 | ||
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Do Pass Higher Education; 012-000-000 | ||
Senate | 04/23/2025 | Assigned to Higher Education | ||
Senate | 04/09/2025 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 04/09/2025 | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Patrick J. Joyce | ||
Senate | 04/08/2025 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | ||
Senate | 04/08/2025 | Arrive in Senate | ||
Senate | 04/08/2025 | First Reading | ||
House | 04/07/2025 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 089-012-000 | ||
House | 03/18/2025 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 03/18/2025 | Second Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 02/27/2025 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 02/26/2025 | Do Pass / Short Debate Higher Education Committee; 010-000-000 | ||
House | 02/04/2025 | Assigned to Higher Education Committee | ||
House | 01/09/2025 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 12/20/2024 | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Anthony DeLuca |