House | 05/14/2025 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller | ||
House | 03/11/2025 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier | ||
House | 03/05/2025 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bradley Fritts | ||
House | 02/20/2025 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst | ||
House | 02/18/2025 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook | ||
House | 02/18/2025 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Paul Jacobs | ||
House | 02/11/2025 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony M. McCombie | ||
House | 02/11/2025 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond | ||
House | 02/04/2025 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Elik | ||
House | 01/28/2025 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 01/28/2025 | First Reading | ||
House | 01/10/2025 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. John M. Cabello |