House | 03/21/2025 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/21/2025 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/05/2025 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Education Policy Committee | ||
House | 03/04/2025 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/04/2025 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Maurice A. West, II | ||
House | 02/11/2025 | Assigned to Education Policy Committee | ||
House | 01/28/2025 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 01/28/2025 | First Reading | ||
House | 01/13/2025 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Maurice A. West, II |