House
|
03/26/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe C. Sosnowski
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin Schmidt
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Sanalitro
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Paul Jacobs
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bradley Fritts
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jason R. Bunting
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Coffey, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2025
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Regan Deering
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2025
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Elik
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2025
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2025
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
|
|
|
House
|
01/28/2025
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/28/2025
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony M. McCombie
|
|
|
House
|
01/21/2025
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Christopher "C.D." Davidsmeyer
|
|
|