Senate
|
04/30/2025
|
Postponed - Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2025
|
Assigned to Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2025
|
Third Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 082-030-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2025
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2025
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2025
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 013-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2025
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2025
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2025
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Will Guzzardi
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2025
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Standard Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2025
|
Second Reading - Standard Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Abdelnasser Rashid
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William "Will" Davis
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregg Johnson
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Briel
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2025
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Standard Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2025
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 008-006-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lisa Davis
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2025
|
Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/28/2025
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2025
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Will Guzzardi
|
|
|