Senate
|
05/01/2025
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 6, 2025
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2025
|
Do Pass Judiciary; 007-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2025
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2025
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2025
|
Assigned to Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2025
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2025
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2025
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2025
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2025
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 10, 2025
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2025
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Briel
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rick Ryan
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Crawford
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nabeela Syed
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lisa Davis
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2025
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 076-040-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Yolonda Morris
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Kelly
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martha Deuter
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2025
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2025
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2025
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2025
|
Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Public Health Committee; 006-003-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2025
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Public Health Committee; by Voice Vote
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2025
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Public Health Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2025
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2025
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Nicolle Grasse
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2025
|
Assigned to Public Health Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2025
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tracy Katz Muhl
|
|
|
House
|
01/28/2025
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2025
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Nicolle Grasse
|
|
|