House
|
04/16/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Beth Canty
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2025
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2025
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Donald P. DeWitte
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2025
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2025
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2025
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Harry Benton
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne M. Ness
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jawaharial Williams
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martha Deuter
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Yolonda Morris
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2025
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Coffey, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2025
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2025
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth "Lisa" Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2025
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Stephens
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandun Schweizer
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jackie Haas
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Matt Hanson
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2025
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2025
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2025
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2025
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2025
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 008-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2025
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2025
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2025
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Nicole La Ha
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2025
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2025
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2025
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Nicole La Ha
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2025
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2025
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2025
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2025
|
Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 008-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rick Ryan
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Faver Dias
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lisa Davis
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Crawford
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicolle Grasse
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Coffey, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Swanson
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Wayne A. Rosenthal
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2025
|
Assigned to State Government Administration Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/28/2025
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2025
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Nicole La Ha
|
|
|